09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
13.09.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
05.10.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
01.10.2018 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
01.10.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.09.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
14.09.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
14.09.2018 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.09.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.09.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
06.04.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
06.04.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
06.04.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
06.04.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
18.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
17.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
14.10.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.03.2009 |
First examination report |
|
25.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.03.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.05.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
09.05.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
23.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|