EP1929524 - MICROELECTRONIC DEVICE PACKAGES, AND STACKED MICROLECETRONIC DEVICE PACKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/24] | MICROELECTRONIC DEVICE PACKAGES, STACKED MICROLECETRONIC DEVICE PACKAGES, AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING MICROELECTRONIC DEVICES | ||
[2018/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way, P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 93716-9632 / US | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YE, Seng Kim Dalson Block 311C, 05-32, Anchorvale Lane Singapore 543311 / SG | 02 /
CHONG, Chin, Hui Block 10h, 07-29 Braddell View, Braddell Hill Singapore 579727 / SG | [2018/45] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
YE, Seng Kim Dalson Block 311C, 05-32, Anchorvale Lane Singapore 543311 / SG | ||
02 /
CHONG, Chin, Hui Block 10h, 07-29 Braddell View, Braddell Hill Singapore 579727 / SG | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/45] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06802317.5 | 25.08.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006US33219 | Priority number, date | SG20050005523 | 26.08.2005 Original published format: SG 200505523 | US20050218028 | 31.08.2005 Original published format: US 218028 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007025127 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1929524 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929524 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/065, H01L25/10 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
H01L25/0657 (EP,US);
H01L25/065 (KR);
H01L21/563 (US);
H01L23/13 (EP,US);
H01L23/3114 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L25/00 (US);
H01L25/105 (EP,US);
H01L25/50 (US);
H01L2224/06135 (EP,US);
H01L2224/06136 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32145 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/4382 (US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4824 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73215 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2225/0651 (EP,US);
H01L2225/0652 (US);
H01L2225/06555 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06572 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06575 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1023 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1041 (EP);
H01L2225/1058 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1088 (EP,US);
H01L25/043 (US);
H01L25/074 (US);
H01L25/0756 (US);
H01L25/10 (US);
H01L25/117 (US);
H01L2924/00 (US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1532 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15331 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/73215, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/4824, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32145, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73215, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/4824, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US) (-) |
Former IPC [2008/24] | H01L25/065 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/45] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAPSELTE MIKROELEKTRONISCHE BAUELEMENTE UND GESTAPELTE VERKAPSELTE MIKROELEKTRONISCHE BAUELEMENTE | [2018/19] | English: | MICROELECTRONIC DEVICE PACKAGES, AND STACKED MICROLECETRONIC DEVICE PACKAGES | [2018/19] | French: | BOITIERS DE DISPOSITIFS MICROELECTRONIQUES, ET EMPILAGES DE TELS BOITIERS | [2018/19] |
Former [2008/24] | KAPSELUNGEN MIKROELEKTRONISCHER BAUELEMENTE, GESTAPELTE KAPSELUNGEN MIKROELEKTRONISCHER BAUELEMENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN MIKROELEKTRONISCHER BAUELEMENTE | ||
Former [2008/24] | MICROELECTRONIC DEVICE PACKAGES, STACKED MICROLECETRONIC DEVICE PACKAGES, AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING MICROELECTRONIC DEVICES | ||
Former [2008/24] | BOITIERS DE DISPOSITIFS MICROELECTRONIQUES, EMPILAGES DE TELS BOITIERS, ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE CES DISPOSITIFS | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 01.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2006 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002171136 (HIRAOKA TETSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2002190391 (ICHIKAWA SUNJI [JP]) [A] 1-6,9-11,13* figures 1,3 *; | [XY]DE10259221 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,9-11,13 * figures 2,3 * [Y] 2 |