EP1940837 - IMIDAZOPYRIDINE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | For all designated states Takeda California, Inc. 10410 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/22] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | ||
For all designated states Takeda Corporation, Inc. 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, NC 19808 / US | |||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | ||
For all designated states Takeda San Diego, Inc. 10410 Science Center Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWATA, Hidehisa C/O TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-Chome Yodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 532-8686 / JP | 02 /
KOHARA, Yasuhisa C/O TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-Chome Yodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 532-8686 / JP | 03 /
CAO, Sheldon X. 10521 Sand Crab Place San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
GUNTUPALLI, Prasuna 6323 Oleander Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 05 /
GWALTNEY, Stephen L. 12246 Dormouse Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 06 /
HOSFIELD, David J. 425 S. Rios Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | 07 /
LIU, Yan 5382 Greenwillow Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 08 /
STAFFORD, Jeffrey A. 12752 Sandy Crest Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 09 /
THROOP, Beverly 12761 Jordan Ridge Court San Diego, CA 92120 / US | [2012/45] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
IWATA, Hidehisa C/O TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-Chome Yodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 532-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
KOHARA, Yasuhisa C/O TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-Chome Yodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 532-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
CAO, Sheldon X. 10521 Sand Crab Place San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
04 /
GUNTUPALLI, Prasuna 6323 Oleander Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
05 /
GWALTNEY, Stephen L. 12246 Dormouse Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
06 /
HOSFIELD, David J. 425 S. Rios Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | |||
07 /
LIU, Yan 5382 Greenwillow Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
08 /
STAFFORD, Jeffrey A. 12752 Sandy Crest Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
09 /
THROOP, Beverly 12761 Jordan Ridge Court San Diego, CA 92120 / US | Representative(s) | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06802913.1 | 01.09.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US34441 | Priority number, date | JP20050254194 | 01.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005254194 | [2008/50] |
Former [2008/28] | JP20050254194U | 01.09.2005 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007028135 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1940837 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940837 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/437, A61P5/48 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/28 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D471/02 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | 12.03.2008 | BA | 12.03.2008 | HR | 12.03.2008 | MK | 12.03.2008 | RS | 12.03.2008 | Title | German: | IMIDAZOPYRIDINVERBINDUNGEN | [2008/28] | English: | IMIDAZOPYRIDINE COMPOUNDS | [2008/28] | French: | COMPOSES A BASE D'IMIDAZOPYRIDINE | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2006 | AT | 07.11.2012 | BE | 07.11.2012 | CY | 07.11.2012 | CZ | 07.11.2012 | DK | 07.11.2012 | EE | 07.11.2012 | FI | 07.11.2012 | IT | 07.11.2012 | LT | 07.11.2012 | LV | 07.11.2012 | MC | 07.11.2012 | NL | 07.11.2012 | PL | 07.11.2012 | RO | 07.11.2012 | SE | 07.11.2012 | SI | 07.11.2012 | SK | 07.11.2012 | TR | 07.11.2012 | BG | 07.02.2013 | GR | 08.02.2013 | ES | 18.02.2013 | IS | 07.03.2013 | PT | 07.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
TR | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
MC | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
IT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
RO | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
EE | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
SK | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
DK | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
BG | 07.02.2013 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 07.11.2012 | |
BE | 07.11.2012 | ||
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
PT | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 07.11.2012 | |
CY | 07.11.2012 | ||
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
SI | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
GR | 08.02.2013 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 07.11.2012 | |
FI | 07.11.2012 | ||
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
LV | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
PL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 07.11.2012 | |
LT | 07.11.2012 | ||
NL | 07.11.2012 | ||
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 18.02.2013 | ||
IS | 07.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 07.11.2012 | |
SE | 07.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 07.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2305339 (THOMAE GMBH DR K) [X] 3-8,12,14,15 * Compounds of general formula I as well as Ia;; claims 1,2,9 *; | [X]DE1445824 (GEIGY AG J R) [X] 3,8,12,14,15 * claims 1,11,12,46 *; | [X]WO03026587 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [X] 3-8 * page 31, compound 64;;; claim 1 *; | [X]JP2001192653 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 12 * page 25 - page 26 *; | [E]EP1702919 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - YUTILOV Y M ET AL, "Preparation of 2-aryl-substituted derivatives of imidazo[4,5-b]pyridine and imidazo[4,5-c]pyridine", CHEMISTRY OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS (A TRANSLATION OF KHIMIYA GETEROTSIKLICHESKIKH SOEDINENII), PLENUM PRESS CO., NEW YORK, NY, US, (1987), no. 5, ISSN 0009-3122, pages 639 - 645, XP002231885 [X] 12 * page 529; compound IF * | by applicant | WO2005063738 | WO0138325 | WO0125228 | WO03042204 | WO9844921 | WO9845285 | WO9922735 | WO9710224 | WO0182925 | WO0187834 | - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 270, pages 30253 - 30256 | - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 272, pages 22564 - 22569 | - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 272, pages 22570 - 22575 | - JAPAN CLINICAL, (2002), vol. 60, pages 523 - 534 | - CELL, (1995), vol. 83, pages 69 - 78 | - NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 721 - 722 | - NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL MEDICINE, (1998), vol. 338, pages 226 - 230 | - "Development of Pharmaceutical Products", Molecule Design, HIROKAWA SHOTEN, (1990), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198 | - COMPREHENSIVE HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY II, (1996), vol. 7, pages 313 - 316 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 5707 - 5716 |