EP1922743 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF USING NANOTUBE FABRICS AS JOULE HEATING ELEMENTS FOR MEMORIES AND OTHER APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nantero, Inc. 25-D Olympia Avenue Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2008/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARD, Jonathan, W. 4271 Sleepy Lake Drive Fairfax, VA 22033 / US | 02 /
RUECKES, Thomas 21 Pleasant Street Rockport, MA 01966 / US | 03 /
MEINHOLD, Mitchell 7 Maynard Street, 2 Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 04 /
SEGAL, Brent, M. 15 Mayflower Road Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/21] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06802997.4 | 06.09.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006US34626 | Priority number, date | US20050714390P | 06.09.2005 Original published format: US 714390 P | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007030483 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1922743 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/02, G11C13/02, H01L45/00, H01L27/24 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H10N70/8613 (EP,US);
G11C13/025 (EP,US);
H10B63/30 (EP,US);
H10N70/231 (EP,US);
H10N70/823 (EP,US);
H10N70/826 (EP,US);
H10N70/8828 (EP,US);
G11C13/0004 (EP,US);
G11C2213/81 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/31] | G11C11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/21] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM MIT NANORÖHRCHENGEWEBE ALS JOULESCHE HEIZELEMENTE FÜR SPEICHER UND ANDERE ANWENDUNGEN | [2008/21] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF USING NANOTUBE FABRICS AS JOULE HEATING ELEMENTS FOR MEMORIES AND OTHER APPLICATIONS | [2008/21] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'UTILISATION DE TISSUS DE NANOTUBES COMME ELEMENTS DE CHAUFFAGE OHMIQUE POUR MEMOIRES ET AUTRES APPLICATIONS | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 25.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5557596 (GIBSON GARY [US], et al) [Y] 6-13,16-23 * column 3, line 36 - column 8, line 57 *; | [A]US2002110177 (NAKAYAMA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 6-23* paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0103] *; | [XA]EP1274092 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-13,16-23 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0019] * [A] 14,15; | [Y]US2005018588 (DUERIG URS T [CH], et al) [Y] 6-13,16-23 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0061]; figures 3,4 *; | [X] - AKITA O ET AL, "Nano-processing tool using a carbon nanotube nano-heater", MICROPROCESSES AND NANOTECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2004. DIGEST OF PAPERS. 2004 INTERNATIONAL OSAKA, JAPAN OCT. 27-29, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041027), ISBN 978-4-9902472-0-1, pages 320 - 321, XP010812213 [X] 1-5 * page 320, paragraph 1 - page 321, paragraph 3 * | [A] - PURCELL S T ET AL, "Hot nanotubes: stable heating of individual multiwall carbon nanotubes to 2000 K induced by the field-emission current", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS APS USA, (20020311), vol. 88, no. 10, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 105502/1 - 4, XP002496669 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.88.105502 | International search | [A]US2003198812 (RUECKES THOMAS [US], et al); | [X]US2004031975 (KERN KLAUS [DE], et al); | [X]US2004145941 (RUST THOMAS F [US]) | by applicant | EP1274092 | US6635951 | - Z. YAO; CL. KANE; C. DEKKER, PHYS. REV. LETT., (2000), vol. 84, page 2941 | - S. BERBER; Y.-K. KWON; D. TOMANEK, PHYS. REV. LETT., (2000), vol. 84, page 4613 | - P.M. AJAYAN; T.W. EBBESEN, REP. PROG. PHYS., (1997), vol. 60, page 1025 |