EP1945126 - ROOT CANAL OBSTRUCTION REMOVAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states San Diego Swiss Machining Inc. 9177 Aero Drive San Diego, CA 92123 / US | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HICKOK, Teresa, R. 4106 Paseo De La Vista Bonita, California 91902 / US | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06803595.5 | 13.09.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006US35836 | Priority number, date | US20050718626P | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 718626 P | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007035409 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1945126 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/02, A61C3/03 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
A61C3/03 (EP,US);
A61C5/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON WURZELKANAL-OBSTRUKTIONEN | [2008/30] | English: | ROOT CANAL OBSTRUCTION REMOVAL SYSTEM | [2008/30] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉLIMINATION D'OBSTRUCTION DE CANAL RADICULAIRE | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5879160 (RUDDLE CLIFFORD J [US]) [A] 1-5,9 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 42 ** figures 5-10 *; | [Y]US6227855 (HICKOK TERESA R [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,9 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 8 * * column 5, lines 6-23 * * column 6, lines 7-9 * * figure - *; | [Y]WO03086223 (SAN DIEGO SWISS MACHINING INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,9 * page 5, lines 16-22 * * page 4, lines 4-16 * * figures 5,7,8 * |