EP1946245 - CLASSIFIED FILTERING FOR TEMPORAL PREDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Electronics, Inc. 1 Sony Drive Park Ridge, NJ 07656 / US | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANICONI, Marco 402 Union Avenue, Unit C Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
CARRIG, James, J. 1652 Hicks Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 03 /
MIAO, Zhourong 4090 Biscotti Place San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06803711.8 | 14.09.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006US36122 | Priority number, date | US20050229286 | 16.09.2005 Original published format: US 229286 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007035539 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1946245 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/36, H04N7/26, H04N7/36 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H04N19/85 (EP,US);
G06V10/20 (KR);
G06F18/00 (KR);
H04B1/66 (KR);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/137 (EP,US);
H04N19/194 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/537 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | G06K9/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/44] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLASSIFIZIERTE FILTERUNG FÜR DIE ZEITLICHE PRÄDIKTION | [2008/30] | English: | CLASSIFIED FILTERING FOR TEMPORAL PREDICTION | [2008/30] | French: | FILTRAGE CLASSE POUR PREDICTION TEMPORELLE | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 17.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1404136 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-3,8-10,15-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0092] *; | [Y] - JOHN WOODS ET AL, "An Overlapped Block Motion Compensation for MC-EZBC", 66. MPEG MEETING; 20-10-2003 - 24-10-2003; BRISBANE; (MOTION PICTUREEXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20031014), no. M10158, ISSN 0000-0261, XP030039036 [Y] 1-3,8-10,15-17 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 5, line 2 * | [Y] - TAE LEUN KIM ET AL, "Fast Image Restoration for Reducing Block Artifacts Based on Adaptive Constrained Optimization", JOURNAL OF VISUAL COMMUNICATION AND IMAGE REPRESENTATION, (19980901), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:10.1006/jvci.1998.0386, ISSN 1047-3203, pages 234 - 242, XP055002648 [Y] 3,10,17 * paragraph [03.2] - paragraph [0004]; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jvci.1998.0386 | [A] - ORCHARD M T ET AL, "OVERLAPPED BLOCK MOTION COMPENSATION: AN ESTIMATION-THEORETIC APPROACH", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19940901), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:10.1109/83.334974, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 693 - 699, XP000476843 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/83.334974 | International search | [X]US6212235 (NIEWEGLOWSKI JACEK [PL], et al) | by applicant | EP1404136 |