EP1946476 - MOBILE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE WITH SOFTWARE INSTALLATION AND VERIFICATION FEATURES AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harris Corporation 1025 W. Nasa Boulevard MS A-11l Melbourne FL 32919 / US | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALUM, Lloyd 282 Clover Hills Drive Rochester, NY 14618 / US | 02 /
BRUTOVSKI, Robert 3 Clifton Road Churchville, NY 14428 / US | 03 /
RERICHA, Chris 166 Greystone Lane, Apt.2 Rochester, NY 14618 / US | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06803924.7 | 20.09.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006US36665 | Priority number, date | US20050256543 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: US 256543 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007050206 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1946476 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L9/32, G06F12/14, G06F11/30 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
G06F21/572 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2139 (EP,US);
H04L63/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | H04L9/00, G06F12/14, H04L9/32, G06F11/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG MIT SOFTWAREINSTALLATIONS- UND VERIFIKATIONSMERKMALEN UND DIESBEZÜGLICHE VERFAHREN | [2008/30] | English: | MOBILE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE WITH SOFTWARE INSTALLATION AND VERIFICATION FEATURES AND RELATED METHODS | [2008/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATIONS RADIO MOBILE AVEC CARACTERISTIQUES D'INSTALLATION ET DE VERIFICATION LOGICIELLES ET PROCEDES APPARENTES | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 19.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005120209 (KWON JI-HUN [KR], et al); | [Y]US6948069 (TEPPLER STEVEN W [US]) |