|
26.07.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2015 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
03.07.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.06.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
28 |