EP1934495 - PROPSHAFT BOOT WITH INTEGRATED BEARING SEAL DEFLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. One Dauch Drive Detroit, MI 48211-1198 / US | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATRASCU, Dumitru, F. 6275 Green Bay Lane West Bloomfieled, MI 48324 / US | 02 /
WEHNER, Robert, J. 14056 Riverside Drive Livonia, MI 48154 / US | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Manitz, Gerhart Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Manitz, Gerhart Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | Manitz, Gerhart Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06804205.0 | 28.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006US37707 | Priority number, date | US20050249245 | 13.10.2005 Original published format: US 249245 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007047050 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1934495 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1934495 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/08 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
F16D3/845 (EP,US);
F16J3/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | F16D3/84 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSWELLENMUFFE MIT INTEGRIERTEM LAGERDICHTUNGSDEFLEKTOR | [2008/26] | English: | PROPSHAFT BOOT WITH INTEGRATED BEARING SEAL DEFLECTOR | [2008/26] | French: | SOUFFLET DE PROTECTION A DEFLECTEUR DE JOINT DE PALIER INTEGRE | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 04.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2006 | AT | 18.09.2013 | BE | 18.09.2013 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | CZ | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | ES | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | IT | 18.09.2013 | LT | 18.09.2013 | LV | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | NL | 18.09.2013 | PL | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | TR | 18.09.2013 | IE | 28.09.2013 | LU | 28.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | FR | 18.11.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | IS | 18.01.2014 | PT | 20.01.2014 | DE | 01.04.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
TR | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 18.11.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 01.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 18.11.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 01.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 01.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
IT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
DE | 01.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/29] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | LT | 18.09.2013 | |
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 18.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0464984 (DRAFTEX IND LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6-20 * column 6, line 39 - line 42; figure 30 * [I] 4,5; | [X]DE4220210 (DANA CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * figures 1-9 *; | [X]US5466084 (BRUEGGEN SHANE J [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 51 - line 64; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]FR2754024 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-20 * figures 2-5 * [I] 4,5,8; | [X]GB2323641 (GKN AUTOMOTIVE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5* figures 1-8 *; | [XI]FR2838487 (GKN GLAENZER SPICER [FR]) [X] 1-3,6-20 * figures 1,3,4 * [I] 4 | International search | [Y]US4936811 (BAKER W HOWARD [US]); | [A]US5183351 (SCHNEIDER DEAN J [US]); | [A]US5853178 (WYDRA NEAL E [US], et al); | [Y]US6179717 (SCHWAERZLER PETER [DE]); | [Y]US6184470 (FROEHLICH FRANZ [DE], et al); | [X]US2004256814 (CREEK STEVE W [US]); | [AP]US7086952 (WEHNER ROBERT J [US]) |