EP1967954 - A METHOD FOR DELETING VIRUS PROGRAM AND A METHOD TO GET BACK THE DATA DESTROYED BY THE VIRUS. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | 24.09.2010 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bai, Jie Room 203, Unit 1, 16 Building XiaoNanZhuang Haidian District Beijing 100089 / CN | For all designated states Li, Wei Room 301, Unit 4, 1 Building, 23rd Yard Changwa Street Haidian District Beijing 100089 / CN | For all designated states Lu, Zhengyu Room 912, 916 Building ZhongGuanCun Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805120.0 | 31.10.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006CN02919 | Priority number, date | CN20051114944 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: CN200510114944 | CN2006107611 | 15.02.2006 Original published format: CN200610007611 | [2008/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007056932 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967954 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/14 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
G06F21/568 (EP,US);
G06F11/1446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM LÖSCHEN EINES VIRUSPROGRAMMS UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZURÜCKERHALTEN DER DURCH DEN VIRUS ZERSTÖRTEN DATEN | [2008/37] | English: | A METHOD FOR DELETING VIRUS PROGRAM AND A METHOD TO GET BACK THE DATA DESTROYED BY THE VIRUS. | [2008/37] | French: | PROCEDE POUR SUPPRIMER UN PROGRAMME CONTENANT UN VIRUS ET PROCEDE POUR RECUPERER LES DONNEES DETRUITES PAR LE VIRUS | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2008 | Translation filed | 14.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03025722 (COMPUTER ASS THINK INC [US]); | [A]CN1508697 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1409222 (RUIXING SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY [CN]) |