EP1962168 - A METHOD FOR DETECTING THE OPERATION BEHAVIOR OF THE PROGRAM AND A METHOD FOR DETECTING AND CLEARING THE VIRUS PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bai, Jie Room 203, Unit 1, 16 Building XiaoNanZhuang Haidian District Beijing 100089 / CN | For all designated states Li, Wei Room 301, Unit 4, 1 Building, 23rd Yard Changwa Street Haidian District Beijing 100089 / CN | For all designated states Lu, Zhengyu Room 912, 916 Building ZhongGuanCun Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Steimle, Josef Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Steimle, Josef Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805123.4 | 31.10.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006CN02922 | Priority number, date | CN20051114946 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: CN200510114946 | CN2006107613 | 15.02.2006 Original published format: CN200610007613 | [2008/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007056934 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1962168 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G06F21/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DETEKTIEREN DES BETRIEBSVERHALTENS DES PROGRAMMS UND VERFAHREN ZUM DETEKTIEREN UND LÖSCHEN DES VIRUSPROGRAMMS | [2008/35] | English: | A METHOD FOR DETECTING THE OPERATION BEHAVIOR OF THE PROGRAM AND A METHOD FOR DETECTING AND CLEARING THE VIRUS PROGRAM | [2008/35] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETECTER LE COMPORTEMENT DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN PROGRAMME ET PROCEDE POUR DETECTER ET EFFACER LE PROGRAMME CONTENANT LE VIRUS | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2008 | Translation filed | 24.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9847069 (SYMANTEC CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *; | [X]US6591362 (LI YUNG FU [TW]) [X] 1,3* column 3, line 59 - column 5, line 13; figure 4 *; | [X]US6775780 (MUTTIK IGOR [GB]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 44 *; | [X] - PETER SZOR, The Art of Computer Virus Research and Defense, AMSTERDAM, ADDISON-WESLEY LONGMAN, (20050217), XP002519812 [X] 1-7 * Chapter 11.12. Behavior Blocking. Chapter 11.13. Sand-Boxing. * | International search | [A]CN1314638 ; | [A]CN1567118 |