EP1879479 - GLASS CABINET FOR STORAGE AND/OR DISPLAY OF OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glasbau Hahn GmbH Hanauer Landstrasse 211 60314 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states GLASBAU HAHN GmbH. Hanauer Landstrasse 211 60314 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Glasbau Hahn GmbH & Co. KG Hanauer Landstrasse 211 D-60314 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Thomas Glasbau Hahn Gmbh + Co. KG Hanauer Landstrasse 211 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2009/43] | Reichel, Wolfgang 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg, Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Reichel, Wolfgang Reichel und Reichel Patentanwälte, Parkstrasse 13 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805617.5 | 22.04.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006EP03719 | Priority number, date | DE20051020440 | 29.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005020440 | [2008/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007019891 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879479 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/00, E05D15/58 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
E05D15/58 (EP,US);
A47F3/005 (EP,US);
E05D2015/586 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VITRINE ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG UND/ODER ZURSCHAUSTELLUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2008/04] | English: | GLASS CABINET FOR STORAGE AND/OR DISPLAY OF OBJECTS | [2008/04] | French: | VITRINE DE STOCKAGE ET/OU D'EXPOSITION D'ARTICLES | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 29.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/06] | 04.10.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE534177 (ADOLF MARCK) [I] 1,2,10 * the whole document *; | [I]US2569254 (PAGE JOHN H) [I] 1-3,6,7,10 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [I]DE2020844 (ZEISER MANFRED PAUL DR) [I] 1,2,5,7 * page 4 - page 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3771847 (AYLWORTH M) [A] 1-3,10* column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 20; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO02101185 (VITRA PATENTE AG [CH], et al) [A] 2-4,6,7,10 * page 7 - page 10; figures 1E,2E,3D,3E,4D,5B,6E *; | [I]EP1449999 (SCHOCK METALLWERK [DE]) [I] 1,2,10 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1,5-7 * | Examination | JPH0856787 | by applicant | DE10261523 |