EP1927263 - CAPACITIVE SOUND TRANSDUCER HAVING A PERFORATED ATTENUATION DISC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sennheiser electronic GmbH & Co. KG Am Labor 1 30900 Wedemark / DE | [2010/44] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Sennheiser Electronic GmbH & Co. KG Am Labor 1 30900 Wedemark / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIBBING, Manfred Flassworth 24 30900 Wedemark / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805695.1 | 12.09.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006EP08865 | Priority number, date | DE20051043664 | 14.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005043664 | [2008/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007031270 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927263 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927263 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04R19/01, H04R1/38 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
H04R1/38 (EP,US);
H04R19/016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/40] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVER SCHALLWANDLER MIT PERFORIERTER DÄMPFUNGSSCHEIBE | [2008/23] | English: | CAPACITIVE SOUND TRANSDUCER HAVING A PERFORATED ATTENUATION DISC | [2008/23] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR ACOUSTIQUE CAPACITIF AYANT UN DISQUE D'AMORTISSEMENT PERFORE | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 15.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE821217 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2,9,12 * page 1, line 33 - page 3, line 12 * * page 3, line 73 - page 5, line 24 *; | [X]GB921818 (RUDOLF GORIKE) [X] 1-4,10,12 * page 1, line 29 - line 73 * * page 2, line 56 - line 101 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3418436 (GEORG NEUMANN) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]US4817168 (FIDI WERNER [AT]) [X] 1-8,10-12 * column 2, line 28 - column 5, line 23 * * figures 3,4 * |