EP1963118 - HYDROPNEUMATIC AXLE SUSPENSION FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydac System GmbH Industriegebiet 66280 Sulzbach/Saar / DE | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTH, Heinz-Peter Am Wald 42 66802 Überherrn / DE | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur Patentanwälte Bartels und Partner, Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06805823.9 | 23.09.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006EP09260 | Priority number, date | DE20051062246 | 24.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005062246 | [2008/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007073786 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1963118 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1963118 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/056 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
B60G17/056 (EP,KR,US);
B60G17/0152 (EP,US);
B60G21/06 (KR);
B60G2202/154 (EP,US);
B60G2202/413 (EP,US);
B60G2202/414 (EP,US);
B60G2400/25 (EP,US);
B60G2400/5122 (EP,US);
B60G2500/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPNEUMATISCHE ACHSFEDERUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2008/36] | English: | HYDROPNEUMATIC AXLE SUSPENSION FOR VEHICLES | [2008/36] | French: | SUSPENSION HYDROPNEUMATIQUE DE L'ESSIEU DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | IE | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | LV | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/26] | CY | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | IE | 13.10.2010 | |
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | LT | 13.10.2010 | |
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | LT | 13.10.2010 | |
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 13.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0615870 (FENDT XAVER GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,4,7* column 3, line 35 - line 50; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1232882 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016]; figure 2; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1277604 (HUSCO INT INC [US]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0033]; figures 2,4; claims 1,7 *; | [AD]DE10232769 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [AD] 1,3 * figure 2; claims 1,5,7 *; | [XY]EP1508461 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0012] - [0036] - [0042] - [0053]; figures 1,2; claims 1,2,5,6,12 * [Y] 7 | by applicant | DE10232769 | EP1508461 |