EP1937992 - DISK BRAKE, PARTICULARLY FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRIMPE, Robert Gänzerberg 15 82234 Wessling / DE | 02 /
RAFFIN, Christian Grasbrunner Weg 4 85630 Grasbrunn / DE | 03 /
CAMILO-MARTINEZ, José Bussardstr. 22 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2008/33] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
TRIMPE, Robert Gänzerberg 15 82234 Wessling / DE | ||
02 /
RAFFIN, Christian Grasbrunner Weg 4 85630 Grasbrunn / DE | |||
03 /
CAMILO-MARTINEZ, José Fasanenstr. 154 82008 Unterhaching / DE | Representative(s) | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Mattusch, Gundula Knorr-Bremse AG, Patentabteilung, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06806167.0 | 11.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006EP09796 | Priority number, date | DE20051049057 | 13.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005049057 | [2008/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007042265 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1937992 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/097 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
F16D65/0977 (EP,US);
F16D2055/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHEIBENBREMSE, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN NUTZFAHRZEUG | [2008/27] | English: | DISK BRAKE, PARTICULARLY FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE | [2008/27] | French: | FREIN A DISQUE CONÇU EN PARTICULIER POUR UN VEHICULE UTILITAIRE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 01.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1473481 (BPW BERGISCHE ACHSEN KG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1069334 (BPW BERGISCHE ACHSEN KG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0665386 (BPW BERGISCHE ACHSEN KG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0703378 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19935036 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * |