EP1951274 - PARAPOXVIRUSES IN COMBINATION WITH CLASSICAL CYTOTOXIC CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AGENTS AS BIOCHEMOTHERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AiCuris GmbH & Co. KG Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 475 42117 Wuppertal / DE | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Olaf Flehenberg 28 42489 Wuelfrath / DE | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Findeisen, Marco, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Findeisen, Marco, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06806214.0 | 12.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006EP09855 | Priority number, date | EP20050025600 | 24.11.2005 Original published format: EP 05025600 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007059821 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1951274 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1951274 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, A61K31/475, A61K31/337, A61P35/00 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K35/768 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N2710/24232 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/76, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | A61K35/76, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARAPOCKEN-VIREN IN KOMBINATION MIT KLASSISCHEN ZYTOTOXISCHEN CHEMOTHERAPEUTIKA ALS BIOCHEMOTHERAPIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2008/32] | English: | PARAPOXVIRUSES IN COMBINATION WITH CLASSICAL CYTOTOXIC CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC AGENTS AS BIOCHEMOTHERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2008/32] | French: | PARAPOXVIRUS COMBINES A DES AGENTS CHIMIOTHERAPEUTIQUES CYTOTOXIQUES CLASSIQUES COMME BIOCHIMIOTHERAPIE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCER | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.12.2009 | CZ | 02.12.2009 | EE | 02.12.2009 | FI | 02.12.2009 | LT | 02.12.2009 | LV | 02.12.2009 | RO | 02.12.2009 | SI | 02.12.2009 | SK | 02.12.2009 | TR | 02.12.2009 | BG | 02.03.2010 | IS | 02.04.2010 | HU | 03.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0069455 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 2 * * page 10, lines 10-21 *; | [DY]WO0204002 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1, lines 4-9 * * page 2, lines 11-15 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 4 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 8 * * example 3; claims 1-3,9,10 *; | [XY]WO03006654 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 1, lines 7-9 * * page 3, lines 27-31 * * page 7, lines 5-9 * * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 6 * * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 10 * [Y] 1-8; | [A] - FRIEBE A ET AL, "Immunomodulatory effects of inactivated parapoxvirus ovis (Orf virus) on human peripheral immune cells: Induction of cytokine secretion in monocytes and Th1-like cells", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY 2004 UNITED STATES, (2004), vol. 78, no. 17, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 9400 - 9411, XP002416484 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.17.9400-9411.2004 | by applicant | EP0312839 |