EP1948606 - 3, 5-DISUBSTITUTED PHENYL-PIPERIDINES AS MODULATORS OF DOPAMINE NEUROTRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): RO | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | 11.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSAB, Filial af NeuroSearch Sweden AB, Sverige c/o NeuroSearch A/S Pederstrupvej 93 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2011/01] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states NSAB, Filial of Neure-Search Sweden AB, Sverige c/o NeuroSearch A/S Pederstrupvej 93 2750 Ballerup / DK | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states NeuroSearch Sweden AB Arvid Wallgrens Backe 20 413 46 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONESSON, Clas Billdals Hagenväg 18 S-427 37 Billdal / SE | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Abildgren, Michael Padkjaer, et al NeuroSearch A/S Patent Department Pederstrupvej 93 2750 Ballerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Abildgren, Michael Padkjaer, et al NeuroSearch A/S Patent Department 93 Pederstrupvej 2750 Ballerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 06806224.9 | 12.10.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006EP09866 | Priority number, date | SE20050002254 | 13.10.2005 Original published format: SE 0502254 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007042295 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948606 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1948606 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/24, A61K31/445, A61P25/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
C07D211/24 (EP,KR,SE,US);
A61K31/4418 (SE);
A61K31/445 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 13.05.2008 | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 3, 5-DISUBSTITUIERTE PHENYL-PIPERIDINE ALS MODULATOREN DER DOPAMIN- NEUROTRANSMISSION | [2008/31] | English: | 3, 5-DISUBSTITUTED PHENYL-PIPERIDINES AS MODULATORS OF DOPAMINE NEUROTRANSMISSION | [2008/31] | French: | PHÉNYL-PIPÉRIDINES DI-SUBSTITUÉES EN 3,5 EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DE LA NEUROTRANSMISSION INDUITE PAR LA DOPAMINE | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 03.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | [2011/50] |
Former [2011/41] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | SI | 05.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0146146 (CARLSSON A RESEARCH AB [SE], et al); | [PX]WO2006040156 (CARLSSON A RESEARCH AB [SE], et al) |