EP1938004 - CONTROL VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR CONTROLLING A STARTING CLUTCH OF AN AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITZER, Anton Am Sportplatz 3/5 88677 Markdorf / DE | 02 /
GIERER, Georg Zehntscheuerstrasse 44 88079 Kressbronn / DE | 03 /
HERRMANN, Markus Gartenstrasse 22 88175 Scheidegg / DE | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Thilo Fuchsbauweg 21 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | [2008/27] | Application number, filing date | 06806256.1 | 13.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006EP09904 | Priority number, date | DE20051050493 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005050493 | [2008/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045401 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938004 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1938004 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/12, F16H61/688 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
F16H61/12 (EP,US);
F16D48/04 (EP,US);
F16D48/066 (EP,US);
F16H61/0206 (EP,US);
F16D2048/0221 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3067 (EP,US);
F16D2500/506 (EP,US);
F16D2500/5114 (EP,US);
F16H2061/1232 (EP,US);
F16H2061/1236 (EP,US);
F16H2061/1244 (EP,US);
F16H2061/126 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVENTILANORDNUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ANFAHRKUPPLUNG EINES AUTOMATGETRIEBES | [2008/27] | English: | CONTROL VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR CONTROLLING A STARTING CLUTCH OF AN AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION | [2008/27] | French: | ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE POUR LA COMMANDE D'UN EMBRAYAGE DE DEMARRAGE D'UNE BOITE DE VITESSES AUTOMATIQUE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 14.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | IE | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | LT | 28.04.2010 | LV | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | IS | 28.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | GB | 13.10.2010 | LU | 13.10.2010 | HU | 29.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | FR | 02.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 28.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
GB | 13.10.2010 | ||
LU | 13.10.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 28.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
GB | 13.10.2010 | ||
LU | 13.10.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 28.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
GB | 13.10.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 28.04.2010 | |
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
GB | 13.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
GB | 13.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | DK | 28.04.2010 | |
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | FI | 28.04.2010 | |
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE10238104 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [YD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10338355 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1519080 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1522754 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102004018962 (GETRAG GETRIEBE ZAHNRAD [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [PDA]DE102004020569 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [PDA] 1-17* the whole document * |