EP1955017 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR UPDATING CARD DATA OF A NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Bayerische Motorenwerke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOCKER, Konrad Dürrenhettenbach 10 84061 Ergoldsbach / DE | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Mayer-Martin, Christian Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-5 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Mayer-Martin, Christian Bayerische Motorenwerke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06806281.9 | 14.10.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006EP09939 | Priority number, date | DE20051053125 | 08.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005053125 | [2008/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007054180 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955017 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/32, G01C21/34 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
G01C21/387 (EP,US);
G01C21/3407 (EP,US);
G01C21/3859 (EP,US);
G01C21/3889 (EP,US);
G01C21/3896 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/07] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG VON KARTENDATEN EINES NAVIGATIONSSYSTEMS UND SYSTEM ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG VON KARTENDATEN EINES NAVIGATIONSSYSTEMS | [2008/33] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR UPDATING CARD DATA OF A NAVIGATION SYSTEM | [2008/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR ACTUALISER DES DONNEES CARTOGRAPHIQUES D'UN SYSTEME DE NAVIGATION | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 18.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/19] | 22.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1403618 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 2,3* paragraphs [0001] , [0013] *; | [X]EP1493992 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0023] , [0024] , [0036] , [0038] , [0044] , [0045] , [0047] , [0049] , [0051] , [0061] - [0063] - [0065] , [0076] , [0077] * | Examination | DE10200375 | EP1253401 | JP2004077254 |