EP1938348 - LOW CURRENT SWITCH FOR MOTOR CAR ANTI-THEFT LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Sécurité Habitacle 76 rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2010/52] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc 94042 Creteil Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIACOMIN, Fabrice c/o VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE Propriété Industrielle 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc F-94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | 02 /
CANARD, Louis c/o VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE Propriété Industrielle 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc F-94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Pothmann, Karsten, et al Valeo Sécurité Habitacle S.A.S. Service Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret - ZI Europarc 94046 Creteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Pothmann, Karsten, et al Valeo Sécurité Habitacle S.A.S. Service Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret - ZI Europarc 94046 Creteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/24] | Jacquot, Ludovic R. G., et al Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Service Propriété Industrielle 76 Rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/48] | Jacquot, Ludovic R. G., et al Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06807094.5 | 09.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006EP67208 | Priority number, date | FR20050010348 | 11.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0510348 | [2008/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007042502 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938348 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1938348 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H27/06 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B60R25/04 (EP,US);
E05B47/00 (KR);
B60R25/2063 (EP,US);
H01H27/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01H35/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIEDERSTROMSCHALTER FÜR EINEN KRAFTFAHRZEUG-ANTIDIEBSTAHLRIEGEL | [2008/27] | English: | LOW CURRENT SWITCH FOR MOTOR CAR ANTI-THEFT LOCK | [2008/27] | French: | INTERRUPTEUR A FAIBLE COURANT POUR VERROU D'ANTIVOL AUTOMOBILE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.07.2011 | CY | 06.07.2011 | CZ | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | HU | 06.07.2011 | IE | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | LV | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | PL | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | LU | 09.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
LU | 09.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
LU | 09.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
LU | 09.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 06.07.2011 | |
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 06.07.2011 | |
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3944762 (COLEMAN ARTHUR, et al) [A] 1-12 * sentences 24-54; figures 1,3d,3e *; | [A]US5946956 (HOETZL MANFRED [AT]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XD]US6223571 (RECTOR STEPHEN W [US]) [XD] 1,2,4-12 * the whole document * |