04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
10.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
30.12.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
02.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
18.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
11.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] |
28.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
09.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
19.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
12.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
21.01.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
02.04.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
05.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.01.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.08.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.06.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.02.2009 |
First examination report |
|
17.02.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
30.05.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
15.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|