EP1938408 - SOLID SEAL WHICH IS OBTAINED BY MEANS OF THERMAL SPRAYING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble Le Ponant D 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIANCHI, Luc 2, rue de la Fontaine Sainte F-37260 Artannes Sur Indre / FR | 02 /
TOULC'HOAT, Joël Bois Ripault F-37300 Joue Les Tours / FR | 03 /
BORIES, Charles 3 rue des Oliviers F-37300 Joue Les Tours / FR | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06807099.4 | 09.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006EP67213 | Priority number, date | FR20050053094 | 11.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0553094 | [2008/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007042505 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1938408 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1938408 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, C04B30/00, C03C8/00, C04B41/00 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
C04B35/00 (EP,US);
C23C24/04 (EP,US);
C23C4/06 (EP,US);
C23C4/185 (EP,US);
F16J15/0806 (EP,US);
H01M8/0276 (US);
H01M8/028 (EP,US);
C04B2235/36 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12007 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12451 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12472 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24471 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTELS THERMISCHEM SPRÜHEN ERHALTENE FESTDICHTUNG | [2008/27] | English: | SOLID SEAL WHICH IS OBTAINED BY MEANS OF THERMAL SPRAYING | [2008/27] | French: | JOINT SOLIDE OBTENU PAR PROJECTION THERMIQUE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IE | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | PL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | LU | 09.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.02.2011 | |
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DXA]DE3631536 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DX] 10-13 * column 2, line 21 - line 56 * * column 3, line 4 - line 11 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 4; examples 1-6 * [A] 1-9,14-17; | [DXA]GB2217349 (UNIV HULL [GB], et al) [DX] 10-13 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 23 * [A] 1-9,14-17; | [A]EP0415217 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5725955 (TAWIL HENRI [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * * column 3, line 35 - line 50 * * column 5, line 14 - line 25; claims 1-20 *; | [DA]US6541146 (XUE LIANG A [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * page 2, line 64 - page 3, line 14 * * column 3, line 39 - line 61 * * column 5, line 27 - line 54 * * column 6, line 24 - line 42 *; | [X]WO2004002655 (CAST CENTRE PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 10-13 * page 4, line 4 - line 25 * * page 5, line 16 - line 28 *; | [E]EP1737059 (GEN ELECTRONIC CO [US]) [E] 1,10* column 1, paragraph 6 - column 3, paragraph 11 * |