EP1986942 - DEVICE FOR COVERING A DANGER AREA ON A ROLL CHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/45] | DEVICE FOR COVERING A DANGER AREA ON A ROLL CHANGER AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DEVICE | ||
[2009/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIMRICH, Bernd, Rudolf Rosenweg 5 97469 Gochsheim / DE | 02 /
KELLER, Martin, Richard Frühlingstr. 56 97753 Karlstadt / DE | 03 /
RITTER, Walter Höhristr. 6 97947 Grünsfeld / DE | 04 /
VORWERK, Franz, Josef J.-Müller-Strasse 5 97255 Zellingen / DE | [2008/45] | Application number, filing date | 06807112.5 | 10.10.2006 | [2008/45] | WO2006EP67227 | Priority number, date | DE20061008104 | 20.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006008104 | [2008/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007096007 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1986942 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1986942 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/00, B65H26/00 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
B65H26/00 (EP,US);
B65H19/00 (EP,US);
B65H2553/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABDECKUNG EINES GEFAHRENBEREICHES AN EINEM ROLLENWECHSLER | [2009/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR COVERING A DANGER AREA ON A ROLL CHANGER | [2009/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECOUVREMENT D' UNE ZONE DANGEREUSE D' UN CHANGEUR DE BOBINE | [2009/17] |
Former [2008/45] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABDECKUNG EINES GEFAHRENBEREICHES AN EINEM ROLLENWECHSLER UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2008/45] | DEVICE FOR COVERING A DANGER AREA ON A ROLL CHANGER AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DEVICE | ||
Former [2008/45] | DISPOSITIF DE RECOUVREMENT D' UNE ZONE DANGEREUSE D' UN CHANGEUR DE BOBINE ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DU DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.07.2009 | CZ | 22.07.2009 | DK | 22.07.2009 | EE | 22.07.2009 | IE | 22.07.2009 | LT | 22.07.2009 | LV | 22.07.2009 | NL | 22.07.2009 | PL | 22.07.2009 | RO | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | SI | 22.07.2009 | SK | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | AT | 10.10.2009 | LU | 10.10.2009 | BG | 22.10.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | ES | 02.11.2009 | IS | 22.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | HU | 23.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
AT | 10.10.2009 | ||
LU | 10.10.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
AT | 10.10.2009 | ||
LU | 10.10.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
AT | 10.10.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 22.07.2009 | |
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
IE | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | LT | 22.07.2009 | |
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | LT | 22.07.2009 | |
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DD253006 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG [DD]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 5; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE3912737 (TRUETZSCHLER & CO [DE]) [A] 1,17 * page 1, lines 30-36 * * claim 11 *; | [A]DE29602098U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1,17 * page 1, line 25 - page 5, line 16; figure 1 *; | [AD]DE10008221 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1-10,17,19,20,40,41 * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 10; figure 2 *; | [A]DE10150810 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1,7,10,12-16 * column 2, line 59 - column 8, line 30; figures 1,2,52 *; | [A]DE10331755 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,17* figures 1-3; claims 1,8 *; | [AD]DE10346984 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1,4-6,8,17 * page 2, paragraph 17 - page 3, paragraph 19; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2005080241 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,8,10-17 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * column 9, paragraph 3 * * claims 27-31 * * figure 3 * | by applicant | CH377250 | DE10008221 | DE10346984 | WO2005080241 |