EP1940890 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POLYISOBUTENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATH, Hans Peter Friedhofstr. 7 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 02 /
MACH, Helmut Kaiserstr. 43 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
WETTLING, Thomas Trifelsring 11 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/40] |
Former [2008/28] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06807243.8 | 13.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006EP67379 | Priority number, date | DE20051049236 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005049236 | [2008/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007042565 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1940890 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940890 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/10, C08F4/14 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
C08F110/10 (EP,US);
C08F10/10 (KR);
C08F4/14 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F110/10, C08F4/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYISOBUTEN | [2008/28] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A POLYISOBUTENE | [2008/28] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DU POLYISOBUTYLENE | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 11.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.01.2011 | CZ | 12.01.2011 | DK | 12.01.2011 | EE | 12.01.2011 | FI | 12.01.2011 | HU | 12.01.2011 | IE | 12.01.2011 | IT | 12.01.2011 | LT | 12.01.2011 | LV | 12.01.2011 | NL | 12.01.2011 | PL | 12.01.2011 | RO | 12.01.2011 | SE | 12.01.2011 | SI | 12.01.2011 | SK | 12.01.2011 | TR | 12.01.2011 | BG | 12.04.2011 | GR | 13.04.2011 | ES | 23.04.2011 | IS | 12.05.2011 | PT | 12.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
TR | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 12.01.2011 | |
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | LT | 12.01.2011 | |
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0363706 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 22 - line 48 *; | [X]WO9929744 (UNIV WESTERN ONTARIO [CA]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10361638 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X] - VINNIK, M. I. ET AL, "Catalytic properties of complex compounds of boron fluoride", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1961:62956, URL: STN, XP002410342 [X] 1-10 * abstract * |