EP1938409 - TUBULAR FUEL CELL MODULE AND THE SEALING DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARRO, Jean-Luc Quartier "la Morelle" F-07700 Bourg Saint-andeol / FR | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/27] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06807346.9 | 17.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006EP67500 | Priority number, date | FR20050053180 | 19.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0553180 | [2008/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045652 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938409 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1938409 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/24, C25B9/18 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
H01M8/243 (EP,US);
H01M8/0271 (EP,US);
H01M8/0282 (EP,US);
H01M8/12 (EP,US);
H01M8/2484 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖHRENFÖRMIGES BRENNSTOFFZELLENMODUL UND DICHTEINRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2008/27] | English: | TUBULAR FUEL CELL MODULE AND THE SEALING DEVICE THEREOF | [2008/27] | French: | MODULE TUBULAIRE DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE ET SON DISPOSITIF POUR JOINT D'ETANCHEITE | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 27.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | IE | 17.03.2010 | LT | 17.03.2010 | LV | 17.03.2010 | PL | 17.03.2010 | RO | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | IS | 17.07.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | HU | 18.09.2010 | LU | 17.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
LU | 17.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
IS | 17.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
LT | 17.03.2010 | ||
LV | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5399442 (SHUNDO HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figures 2,3 * * column 4, line 62 - line 68 * * column 5, line 62 - line 63 *; | [A]WO9604690 (DODGE CLEVELAND E [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 25, line 25 - line 27 * * figures 1,8,9,15 *; | [A]US6291089 (PIASCIK JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 3 * * column 3, line 37 - line 38 * * column 5, line 51 - line 54 * * column 6, line 7 - line 9 * * column 7, line 65 - line 66 *; | [A]US6670068 (DIEZ ARMIN [DE]) [A] 1-8* figure 8 * |