EP1957632 - TISSUE ENGINEERING USING PURE POPULATIONS OF ISOLATED NON-EMBRYOBLASTIC FETAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Zürich Protektorat Forschung, Rämistrasse 71 8006 Zürich / CH | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Dörthe Florastrasse 11 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | 02 /
BREYMANN, Christian Bergstrasse 41 8702 Zollikon / CH | 03 /
ZÜND, Gregor Glärnischstrasse 15 CH-8704 Herrliberg / CH | 04 /
HOERSTRUP, Simon P. Klusweg 19 CH-8032 Zürich / CH | 05 /
ACHERMANN, Josef Rübenweg 11 CH-8032 Zürich / CH | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Bremi, Tobias Hans Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Bremi, Tobias Hans Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2009/45] | Bremi, Tobias Hans Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2008/34] | Schnabel, Jörg Habermann, Hruschka & Schnabel Montgelasstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06807548.0 | 25.10.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006EP67775 | Priority number, date | EP20050023702 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05023702 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007048813 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1957632 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1957632 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/07 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
C12N5/0605 (EP,US);
C12N5/0691 (EP,US);
C12N5/0697 (EP,US);
C12N2506/03 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | C12N5/06, C12N5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | GEWEBEREKONSTRUKTION UNTER VERWENDUNG REINER POPULATIONEN ISOLIERTER FÖTALER NICHTEMBRYOBLASTENZELLEN | [2008/34] | English: | TISSUE ENGINEERING USING PURE POPULATIONS OF ISOLATED NON-EMBRYOBLASTIC FETAL CELLS | [2008/34] | French: | PRODUCTION DE TISSUS PAR INGENIERIE GENETIQUE A L'AIDE DE POPULATIONS PURES DE CELLULES FOETALES ISOLEES NON EMBRYOBLASTIQUES | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10179831.2 / EP2267114 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2006 | AT | 30.05.2012 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | DK | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | FI | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | PL | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SE | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | LU | 25.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
LU | 25.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03042405 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * page 23 * * page 8; figure 5e *; | [X] - PRUSA ANDREA-ROMANA ET AL, "Amniotic fluid cells and human stem cell research: a new connection.", MEDICAL SCIENCE MONITOR : INTERNATIONAL MEDICAL JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL RESEARCH NOV 2002, (200211), vol. 8, no. 11, ISSN 1234-1010, pages RA253 - RA257, XP002419092 [X] 1-29 * page RA255, column 2, paragraph 4 - page RA256, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 2 * | [X] - KAVIANI AMIR ET AL, "The placenta as a cell source in fetal tissue engineering.", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRIC SURGERY JUL 2002, (200207), vol. 37, no. 7, ISSN 1531-5037, pages 995 - 999 ; dis, XP002419093 [X] 1-29 * page 996 - page 999; figure 3; table 1 * | [X] - DE COPPI PAOLO ET AL, "Pluripotent stem cells derived from human chorionic villi and amniotic fluid for tissue engineering applications", FASEB JOURNAL, & EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY 2005 MEETING/35TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF PHYSIOLOGICAL SCIENCES; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; MARCH 31 -APRIL 06, 2005, (200503), vol. 19, no. 5, Suppl. S, Part 2, ISSN 0892-6638, page A1366, XP009078624 [X] 1-29 * the whole document * | [A] - UNGER R E ET AL, "Endothelialization of a non-woven silk fibroin net for use in tissue engineering: growth and gene regulation of human endothelial cells", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (200409), vol. 25, no. 21, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 5137 - 5146, XP004504203 [A] 4-6 * page 5137, column 2 - page 5138, column 1; figures 1,2,4-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2003.12.040 | [A] - HOERSTRUP SIMON P ET AL, "Tissue engineering of functional trileaflet heart valves from human marrow stromal cells", CIRCULATION, (20020924), vol. 106, no. 13 Supplement, ISSN 0009-7322, pages I - 143, XP002419094 [A] 12,13,22,23,27,28 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHMIDT D ET AL, "Umbilical Cord Blood Derived Endothelial Progenitor Cells for Tissue Engineering of Vascular Grafts", THE ANNALS OF THORACIC SURGERY, ELSEVIER, (200412), vol. 78, no. 6, ISSN 0003-4975, pages 2094 - 2098, XP004700032 [A] 12,13,22,23,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.athoracsur.2004.06.052 | [A] - DELLA ROCCA F ET AL, "Cell composition of the human pulmonary valve: a comparative study with the aortic valve--the VESALIO Project. Vitalitate Exornatum Succedaneum Aorticum labore Ingegnoso Obtinebitur.", THE ANNALS OF THORACIC SURGERY NOV 2000, (200011), vol. 70, no. 5, ISSN 0003-4975, pages 1594 - 1600, XP002419095 [A] 12,13,22,23,27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-4975(00)01979-2 | [T] - SCHMIDT DOERTHE ET AL, "Tissue engineered heart valves based on human cells", SWISS MEDICAL WEEKLY, (200609), vol. 136, no. 39-40, ISSN 1424-7860, pages 618 - 623, XP002419096 [T] 1-29 * page 620, column 1, paragraph 1; table 2 * * page 622, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 3 * | [T] - SCHMIDT DOERTHE ET AL, "Living autologous heart valves engineered from human prenatally harvested progenitors", CIRCULATION, (200607), vol. 114, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0009-7322, pages I125 - I131, XP002419097 [T] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.105.001040 |