EP1942957 - BIODEGRADABLE SCAFFOLD WITH ECM MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Revocation of patent | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebæk / DK | [2012/28] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Peter Sylvest Mosestedet 45 DK-3500 Vaerloese / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Brian Granstien 5 DK-3330 Goerloese / DK | 03 /
JESPERSEN, Lene Karin Soerupvej 48 DK-3480 Fredensborg / DK | 04 /
EVERLAND, Hanne Todisvej 62 DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 05 /
NIELSEN, Lene Feldskov Peder Skramsgade 26a, 3. DK-1054 Copenhagen K / DK | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/28] | Application number, filing date | 06807590.2 | 26.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006EP67837 | Priority number, date | DK20050001490 | 27.10.2005 Original published format: DK 200501490 | US20050733208P | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 733208 P | DK20060000570 | 24.04.2006 Original published format: DK 200600570 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007048831 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1942957 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1942957 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/00 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
A61L27/3633 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARES GERÜST MIT ECM-MATERIAL | [2008/29] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE SCAFFOLD WITH ECM MATERIAL | [2008/29] | French: | SQUELETTE BIODEGRADABLE AVEC MATERIAU DE MATRICE EXTRACELLULAIRE | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Aechter, Bernd Mauerkircherstr. 45 81679 München / DE Opponent's representative Hollatz, Christian, et al, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Aechter, Bernd Mauerkircherstr. 45 81679 München / DE Opponent's representative Hollatz, Christian, et al, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | 21.05.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2014 | 13.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.11.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/14] | 12.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2006 | AT | 11.07.2012 | BE | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | IT | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | ES | 22.10.2012 | IE | 26.10.2012 | LU | 26.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 26.10.2012 | ||
LU | 26.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 26.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 26.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 26.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0016818 (AESCHLIMANN DANIEL [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * see whole doc. esp. claims and p.4, l.1 ff. *; | [X]WO9718842 (FIDIA ADVANCED BIOPOLYMERS SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-10 * see whole doc esp. claims and examples *; | [A]US5749895 (SAWYER PHILIP N [US], et al) [A] * see whole doc. esp. claims and col. 3, 2. par. ff. *; | [A]EP1481694 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] * see whole doc. esp. claims and examples *; | [A]EP1498128 (NETECH INC [JP]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US2004110439 (CHAIKOF ELLIOT L [US], et al) [A] * see whole doc. esp. claims and p.2, 1.col. 1 par. ff. * | [XD] - BADYLAK S. F., "The extracellular matrix as a scaffold for tissue reconstruction", CELL & DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 13, pages 377 - 383, XP002385100 [XD] 1-10 * the whole document * |