Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009515105 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005052689 | 04.11.2005 | WO2006EP68034 | 02.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1943432 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005052689 | 04.11.2005 | WO2006EP68034 | 02.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007051818 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005052689 | 04.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005052689 | 16.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005052689 | 04.11.2005 |