EP1945467 - INFORMATION PAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto Oy Myllynkivenkuja 4 01620 Vantaa / FI | [2016/08] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Gemalto Oy Turvalaaksonkaari 2 01741 Vantaa / FI | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Setec Oy Suometsänkaari 2 01740 Vantaa / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERLIN, Jari Lohkopellontie 3 C 22 FI-00650 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
KORHONEN, Maila Vaahtokuja 2 B 12 FI-01600 Vantaa / FI | 03 /
POHJOLA, Teemu Tiaisentie 3 B 3 FI-02660 Espoo / FI | 04 /
SYRJÄNEN, Taru Hansinkatu 2 C 19 FI-01400 Vantaa / FI | 05 /
HOLMBERG, Mika Professorintie 10 A 11 FI-00330 Helsinki / FI | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Lotaut, Yacine Diaw Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2008/30] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06808021.7 | 07.11.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006FI50480 | Priority number, date | FI20050005596 | 08.11.2005 Original published format: FI 20055596 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007054618 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1945467 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1945467 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/00, B42D13/00, // B42D25/24 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
B42C5/00 (EP,FI,US);
B42D25/46 (FI,US);
B42D13/00 (EP,FI,US);
B42D25/00 (EP,FI,US);
B42D25/24 (EP,FI,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | B42D15/10, B42D111/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSSEITE | [2008/30] | English: | INFORMATION PAGE | [2008/30] | French: | PAGE D'INFORMATION | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 18.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 10.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2015 | 17.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2016
21.12.2016
ADMISSIBLE Bundesdruckerei GmbH Kommandantenstrasse 18 10969 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/39] |
Former [2018/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2016
21.12.2016
ADMISSIBLE Bundesdruckerei GmbH Kommandantenstrasse 18 10969 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2017/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.12.2016
21.12.2016
ADMISSIBLE Bundesdruckerei GmbH Kommandantenstrasse 18 10969 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 20.01.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.05.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.06.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/33] | 27.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 02.05.2019 | Appeal received No. T1317/19 | 10.07.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 27.06.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 30.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T1317/19 | 02.07.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 27.06.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 10.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | FI | 07.11.2021 | GB | 07.11.2021 | ES | 08.11.2021 | SE | 08.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | DK | 30.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | IE | 30.11.2021 | PT | 09.05.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2023/46] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 07.11.2021 | ||
GB | 07.11.2021 | ||
SE | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
DK | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
IE | 30.11.2021 | ||
PT | 09.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 07.11.2021 | ||
GB | 07.11.2021 | ||
SE | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
DK | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
PT | 09.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 07.11.2021 | ||
GB | 07.11.2021 | ||
SE | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
DK | 30.11.2021 | ||
PT | 09.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 07.11.2021 | ||
SE | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
DK | 30.11.2021 | ||
PT | 09.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 07.11.2021 | ||
SE | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
PT | 09.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
PT | 09.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
PT | 09.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 16.03.2016 | |
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | LT | 16.03.2016 | |
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | LT | 16.03.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1008459 (ENSCHEDE SDU BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 * [I] 3,7; | [XI]EP1502765 (TRUEB AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] * [I] 3,7; | [XP]WO2006053738 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE], et al) [XP] 1,2,4-6,8* page 3 - page 5 * | International search | [X]EP1008459 (ENSCHEDE SDU BV [NL]); | [X]EP1574359 (CANADIAN BANK NOTE CO LTD [CA]); | [X]EP1502765 (TRUEB AG [CH]); | [A]WO2004110780 (SETEC OY [FI], et al) | by applicant | EP1502765 | WO2006053738 | EP1008459 | Opposition | DD54334 | EP1008459 | EP1213155 | US2004239097 | WO2004110780 | EP1502765 | EP1574359 | WO2006053738 | WO2006097276 | - "A passport with machine readable capability", ICAO Doc. 9303, (19801100), XP055334850 | - "Chapter 1", R.L. VAN RENESSE, Optical Document Security. 2nd ed., (19980000), pages 1 - 29, XP055334860 |