EP1929053 - METHOD FOR MAKING A STEEL PART OF MULTIPHASE MICROSTRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal France 1- 5, rue Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint Denis / FR | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORQUILLET, Jacques 12 rue Saint-Jacques F-13800 Istres / FR | 02 /
DEVROC, Jacques 23 avenue Victor Hugo F-13200 Arles / FR | 03 /
HOCHARD, Jean-Louis 13 rue de Wendel F-57700 Hayange / FR | 04 /
LAURENT, Jean-Pierre 12 allée du Foin de Crau F-13800 Istres / FR | 05 /
MOULIN, Antoine 2 rue du Rucher F-57140 Woippy / FR | 06 /
ROMANOWSKI, Nathalie 43 Boucle du Bois F-57310 Rurange les Thionville / FR | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/24] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ArcelorMittal France R& D - Intellectual Property 1-5 Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | Application number, filing date | 06808157.9 | 18.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006FR02135 | Priority number, date | EP20050291958 | 21.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05291958 | [2008/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007034063 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1929053 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929053 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/18, C21D7/13, C21D1/673, C23C2/26 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
C23C2/26 (EP,US);
C21D1/185 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/673 (EP,KR,US);
C21D7/13 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/48 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/06 (KR);
C23C2/12 (KR);
C23C2/261 (KR);
C21D2211/001 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/002 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STAHLTEILS MIT MEHRPHASIGER MIKROSTRUKTUR | [2008/24] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING A STEEL PART OF MULTIPHASE MICROSTRUCTURE | [2008/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D UNE PIECE EN ACIER DE MICROSTRUCTURE MULTI-PHASEE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010435.5 / EP2287344 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | IE | 22.06.2011 | LT | 22.06.2011 | LV | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | LU | 18.09.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | IS | 22.10.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | [2013/29] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LU | 18.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 22.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59211533 ; | [A]JPS6043430 ; | [A]US4222796 (DAVIES RICHARD G) [A] 1-4,6,7 * column 3, line 16 - line 23 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 28 * * column 6, line 5 - line 11 *; | [A]FR2671749 (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]) [A] 1,13 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP1013785 (LORRAINE LAMINAGE [FR]) [A] 1,13-16* paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0015] , [0017]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2004163439 (ARNS WILHELM [DE], et al) [A] 1,13-16 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0015] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850406), vol. 009, no. 078, Database accession no. (C - 274), & JP59211533 A 19841130 (NITSUSHIN SEIKOU KK) [A] 1,3-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850716), vol. 009, no. 171, Database accession no. (C - 291), & JP60043430 A 19850308 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 1,8-12,17-19 * abstract * |