EP1955300 - APPARATUS FOR ACTUATING A SAFETY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fireco Limited Newell House 31 High Street Brighton BN2 1RP, West Sussex / GB | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PURSSEY, Neil, Kenneth Newall House 31 High Street Brighton BN2 1RP East Sussex / GB | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Murray, Elisabeth Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06808561.2 | 16.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006GB04272 | Priority number, date | GB20050023375 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: GB 0523375 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007057672 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1955300 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/00, E05F3/22 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
G08B17/00 (EP,GB);
E05C17/446 (EP,GB);
E05C17/56 (EP,GB);
G08B13/1672 (EP);
E05B17/0087 (EP);
E05B2047/0015 (EP);
E05B2047/0016 (EP);
E05B2047/0023 (EP);
E05B47/0012 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETÄTIGEN EINER SICHERHEITSEINRICHTUNG | [2008/33] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ACTUATING A SAFETY DEVICE | [2008/33] | French: | APPAREIL POUR ACTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 11.11.2011 | Observations by third parties | 05.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Observations by third parties | 24.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/04] | 17.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2019 | 18.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3777423 (COULTER G, et al); | [XAY]US4464651 (DUHAME DEAN C [US]); | [DXY]US4520503 (KIRST JOHN A [US], et al); | [A]US4691783 (STERN GEOFFREY S [IL], et al); | [XA]WO0171308 (OPTIMA SOLUTIONS UK LTD [GB], et al) | Examination | US5878530 | other | US5638047 | US5878530 | US6249221 |