|
20.12.2018 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2012 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2011 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
26 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
10 |