21.12.2018 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
17.12.2018 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
03.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.12.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2013 |
Change: Observations by third parties |
|
05.02.2013 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
04.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
05.11.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
05.11.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
31.10.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.08.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
16.05.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
04.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2012 |
First examination report |
|
05.01.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.12.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.11.2011 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
08.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
11.07.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
02.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|