EP1963370 - BISPECIFIC LIGANDS WITH BINDING SPECIFICITY TO CELL SURFACE TARGETS AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Domantis Limited 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge Cambridgeshire, CB4 OWG / GB | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE ANGELIS, Elena 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge CB4 0WG / GB | 02 /
HOLMES, Steve 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge CB4 0WG / GB | 03 /
TOMLISON, Ian, M. 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge CB4 0WG / GB | 04 /
HUANG, Eric, Yi-Chun 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge CB4 0WG / GB | 05 /
HOLT, Lucy, J. 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge CB4 0WG / GB | 06 /
EVERETT, Claire, E. 315 Cambridge Science Park Cambridge CB4 0WG / GB | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Clube, Jasper Rupert, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Clube, Jasper Rupert, et al GlaxoSmith Kline CIP - CN 925.1 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 06808727.9 | 05.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006GB04565 | Priority number, date | US20050742992P | 06.12.2005 Original published format: US 742992 P | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007066109 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1963370 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, A61K38/02 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (KR);
A61K47/6817 (EP,US);
A61K47/6843 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K47/6853 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR);
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (KR);
C07K16/3007 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | HR | 20.06.2008 | Title | German: | BISPEZIFISCHE LIGANDEN MIT BINDUNGSSPEZIFITÄT FÜR ZIELE AN DER ZELLOBERFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN ANWENDUNG | [2008/36] | English: | BISPECIFIC LIGANDS WITH BINDING SPECIFICITY TO CELL SURFACE TARGETS AND METHODS OF USE THEREFOR | [2008/36] | French: | LIGANDS BISPECIFIQUES AYANT UNE SPECIFICITE DE LIAISON A DES CIBLES DE SURFACE CELLULAIRE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 05.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/12] | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2006099875 (GENMAB AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-7,44-53 * paragraph [0098] *; | [A]WO2004032961 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-108 * page 12, line 16 - line 17 *; | [A]WO2005044858 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-108 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004058820 (DOMANTIS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 25 * sequence 10 * | [X] - VALLERA DANIEL A ET AL, "A bispecific recombinant immunotoxin, DT2219, targeting human CD19 and CD22 receptors in a mouse xenograft model of B-cell leukemia/lymphoma.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH 15 MAY 2005, (20050515), vol. 11, no. 10, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 3879 - 3888, XP002425289 [X] 1-108 * page 3885 - page 3886 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-04-2290 | [X] - SCHMIDT M ET AL, "A BIVALENT SINGLE-CHAIN ANTIBODY-TOXIN SPECIFIC FOR ERB-2 AND THE EGF RECEPTOR", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960208), vol. 65, no. 4, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 538 - 546, XP000646380 [X] 11-108 * page 538 * * page 549 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19960208)65:4<538::AID-IJC24>3.0.CO;2-4 | [PX] - IAN TOMLINSON, "Domantis Dual Targeting Domain antibodies shown to kill multiple myeloma cells and spare healthy cells", IBD ANTIBODY ENGINEERING 2005, (20051207), URL: http://www.domantis.com/IBC%20Tomlinson%2007_12_05%20for.pdf, (20070319), XP002425290 [PX] 1-108 * IBC's 16th International Conference on Antibody Engineering, San Diego, 5-8 December 2005 * | [L] - DOMANTIS, "DOMANTIS? DUAL TARGETING DOMAIN ANTIBODIES SHOWN TO KILL MULTIPLE MYELOMA CELLS AND SPARE HEALTHY CELLS", PRESS RELEASE, (20051207), URL: http://www.domantis.com/, (20070319), XP002428485 [L] * the whole document * | Examination | - Funaro ET AL, "CD38 functions are regulated through an internalization step.", The Journal of Immunology, (19980301), vol. 160, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2238 - 2247, XP055025944 | - LIU CHUNSHENG ET AL, "Targeted Gene Delivery into Human Myeloma Cells by an Engineered Anti-CD38 Single Chain Variable Fragment (scFv)-Protamine Complex.", BLOOD, & 44TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY; PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA; DECEMBER 06-10, 2002, (20021116), vol. 100, no. 11, ISSN 0006-4971, page Abstract No. 791 |