EP1957669 - DETECTION OF NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCE MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deltadot Limited Bessemer Building (RSM) Prince Consort Road South Kensington London SW7 2BW / GB | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISAACS, David 37 Narcissus Road West Hampstead NW6 1TL / GB | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Venner, Julia Ann, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Venner, Julia Ann, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Fleck, Barbara Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06808783.2 | 30.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006GB50421 | Priority number, date | GB20050024299 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: GB 0524299 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007063345 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957669 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6816 (GB);
C12Q1/6869 (GB);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2527/107, C12Q2523/313 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHWEIS EINER NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZMODIFIKATION | [2008/34] | English: | DETECTION OF NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCE MODIFICATION | [2008/34] | French: | DÉTECTION D'UNE MODIFICATION D'UNE SÉQUENCE D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/11] | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03036302 (DELTADOT LTD [GB], et al); | [X]EP1347062 (KYUSHU TLO CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO03102238 (DELTADOT LTD [GB], et al); | [PX]WO2006095257 (UNIV BOLOGNA ALMA MATER [IT], et al); | Examination | US2001046678 |