EP1951414 - DEVICE FOR MIXING OR AMALGAMATING PRODUCTS IN LIQUID, GRANULAR OR POWDER FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STARDALE LTD. Unit 403, 4/F Dominion Centre 43-59 Queen's Road East Wanchai Hong Kong / CN | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRESSANI, Gian, Marco 20E Greenmont Court Discovery Bay Hong Kong Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
CHNG, Soo, Chuan Block 581 Pasir Ris Street 53 Singapore 07-13 / SG | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Rondano, Davide, et al Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Rondano, Davide, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06809550.4 | 10.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006IB53709 | Priority number, date | IT2005TO00726 | 12.10.2005 Original published format: IT TO20050726 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007043004 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1951414 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01F11/00, B01F9/00 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
B01F29/30 (EP,US);
B01F31/265 (EP,US);
B01F29/80 (EP,US);
B01F31/70 (EP,US);
B01F35/423 (EP,US);
B01F2101/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN ODER AMALGAMIEREN VON PRODUKTEN IN FLÜSSIGER FORM, KÖRNIGER FORM ODER PULVERFORM | [2008/32] | English: | DEVICE FOR MIXING OR AMALGAMATING PRODUCTS IN LIQUID, GRANULAR OR POWDER FORM | [2008/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MELANGEAGE OU D'AMALGAMATION DE PRODUITS SOUS FORME LIQUIDE, GRANULAIRE OU PULVERULENTE | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4415270 (HEINIS ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 56; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0317112 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [A]US5268620 (HELLENBERG LEEN [NL]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0617998 (COROB SRL [IT]) [X] 1-5,13,17,18 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-3 * [Y] 14-16; | [Y]US5906433 (MAZZALVERI LEOPOLDO [IT]) [Y] 14-16 * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 31; figures 1,2 * |