EP1943604 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING ATTACKS ON THE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARBE, Joachim c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH; Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
OSTERTUN, Soenke c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH; Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Krott, Michel, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/29] | Peters, Carl Heinrich, et al NXP Semiconductors IP Department Stresemannallee 101 22529 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06809608.0 | 16.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006IB53798 | Priority number, date | EP20050109899 | 24.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05109899 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007049181 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943604 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/02 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
G06F12/14 (KR);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F21/554 (EP,US);
G06F21/77 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2101 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERHINDERN VON ATTACKEN AUF DIE HALBLEITERANORDNUNG | [2008/29] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING ATTACKS ON THE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2008/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCEDE POUR PREVENIR DES ATTAQUES SUR CE DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003149914 (KIM JONG-CHEOL [KR]) [X] 1,6,13,16-19 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * [Y] 2-5,7-12,14,15,20-22; | [Y]EP1220101 (ST MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [Y] 2-5,7-12,14,15,20-22 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0052] *; | [X]WO2004063910 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,13,16-19 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 5 * * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 5 * * claim 7 *; | [X]WO0103084 (BULL CP8 [FR], et al) [X] 1,6,13,16-19 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 16 * * page 6, line 29 - page 8, line 5 * * page 10, line 14 - page 12, line 7 *; | [A]EP0481881 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1-22 * column 3, line 37 - line 56 * * column 4, line 10 - line 30 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0045244 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NA [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 3, line 10 - line 17 * * page 7, line 3 - line 12 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 12 * | by applicant | US2003149914 |