EP1982029 - Multi-level automated car parking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/43] | MULTI-LEVEL AUTOMATED CAR PARKING SYSTEM | ||
[2013/43] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Subramanian, Venkatraman 9 First Street, Kamaraj Nagar Nagalkeni-Chromepet Chennai 600 044, Tamilnadu / IN | For all designated states Venkatraman, Guruprasad 9 First Street, Kamaraj Nagar Nagalkeni-Chromepet Chennai 600 011, Tamilnadu / IN | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Lorente Berges, Ana, et al A2 Estudio Legal C/ Maria de Molina n° 41 28006 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Lorente Berges, Ana, et al Avenida General Perón N° 19 Planta Baja, Puerta C 28020 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/43] | Lorente Berges, Ana A2 Estudio Legal C/Félix Boix 3 - 7. C 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06809943.1 | 11.09.2006 | [2008/43] | WO2006IN00344 | Priority number, date | IN2005CHE1278 | 13.09.2005 Original published format: IN CH12782005 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007032024 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1982029 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 07.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/24 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
E04H6/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Title | German: | Automatisches Parksystem mit mehreren Ebenen | [2013/43] | English: | Multi-level automated car parking system | [2013/43] | French: | Système de parking automobile automatisé à plusieurs niveaux | [2013/43] |
Former [2008/43] | AUTOMATISCHES PARKSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN EBENEN | ||
Former [2008/43] | MULTI-LEVEL AUTOMATED CAR PARKING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2008/43] | SYSTEME DE PARKING AUTOMOBILE AUTOMATISE A PLUSIEURS NIVEAUX | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]DE9305367U (ITM IND CONSULT GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]US1852633 (HENRY ZIEBARTH ERNEST); | [A]US5066187 (HAMMER HANS [DE]) | by applicant | US5024571 | US3984012 | DE9305367U | IN201913 |