EP1950388 - TWO-STAGE SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1 Minami-ohi 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8722 / JP | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Naoya c/o Isuzu Advanced Engineering Center, LTD., 8, Tsuchidana, Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252-8501 / JP | 02 /
NITTA, Junichiro c/o Isuzu Advanced Engineering Center, LTD., 8, Tsuchidana, Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252-8501 / JP | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | WSL Patentanwälte Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Seiffert, Klaus, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06810501.4 | 25.09.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006JP318933 | Priority number, date | JP20050334343 | 18.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005334343 | [2008/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007058017 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1950388 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/18, F02B37/00, F02B37/013, F02B37/16, F02M25/07 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
F02B37/004 (EP,US);
F02B37/013 (EP,US);
F02B37/16 (EP,US);
F02B37/162 (EP,US);
F02B37/18 (EP,US);
F02B37/183 (EP,US);
F02B37/22 (EP,US);
F02M26/08 (EP,US);
F02M26/23 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/50] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEISTUFIGES AUFLADESYSTEM FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2008/31] | English: | TWO-STAGE SUPERCHARGING SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2008/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURALIMENTATION À DEUX ÉTAGES POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2011/34] |
Former [2008/31] | SYSTEME DE SURALIMENTATION A DEUX ETAGES POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2008 | Translation filed | 18.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 19.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JPH01142214 (KANESAKA GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK) [I] 1 * abstract *[Y] 2,3; | [IY]US4930315 (KANESAKA HIROSHI [JP]) [I] 1 * figures 1,3; claim 1 * * column 3, lines 11,12,18,19 * [Y] 2,3; | [A]EP1306534 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1387063 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract *; | [IPY]EP1679429 (BORGWARNER INC [US], et al) [IP] 1 * paragraphs [0046] , [0049] - [0051] - [0054]; figure 6; claims 1,10 * [Y] 2,3 |