EP1930332 - LUMINESCENT VARGULA LUCIFERIN SUBSTRATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | [2015/23] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states National Institute Of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHMIYA, Yoshihiro c/o Kansai Center NATIONAL INST. ADVANCE IND. SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi Osaka 563-8577 / JP | 02 /
WU, Chun c/o Kansai Center NATIONAL INST. ADVANCE IND. SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi Osaka 563-8577 / JP | [2015/23] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
OHMIYA, Yoshihiro c/o Kansai Center NATIONAL INST. ADVANCE IND. SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi Osaka 563-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
WU, Chun c/o Kansai Center NATIONAL INST. ADVANCE IND. SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi Osaka 563-8577 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/23] |
Former [2008/24] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06810525.3 | 25.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006JP319000 | Priority number, date | JP20050277020 | 26.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005277020 | JP20060024176 | 01.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006024176 | JP20060073818 | 17.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006073818 | JP20060130203 | 09.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006130203 | [2008/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007034952 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930332 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1930332 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07C45/64, C07C45/68, C07C49/35 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
C07C45/68 (EP,US);
C07C49/175 (EP,US);
C07C49/185 (EP,US);
C07C49/255 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/68, C07C49/175 (US,EP);
C07C45/68, C07C49/185 (US,EP);
C07C45/68, C07C49/255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUMINESZIERENDES VARGULA-LUCIFERINSUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2008/24] | English: | LUMINESCENT VARGULA LUCIFERIN SUBSTRATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2008/24] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE VARGULA LUCIFERIN LUMINESCENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DUDIT SUBSTRAT | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2008 | Translation filed | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP15000899.3 / EP2940020 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2006 | AT | 03.06.2015 | BE | 03.06.2015 | CY | 03.06.2015 | CZ | 03.06.2015 | DK | 03.06.2015 | EE | 03.06.2015 | ES | 03.06.2015 | FI | 03.06.2015 | IT | 03.06.2015 | LT | 03.06.2015 | LV | 03.06.2015 | MC | 03.06.2015 | NL | 03.06.2015 | PL | 03.06.2015 | RO | 03.06.2015 | SE | 03.06.2015 | SI | 03.06.2015 | SK | 03.06.2015 | TR | 03.06.2015 | BG | 03.09.2015 | GR | 04.09.2015 | IE | 25.09.2015 | LU | 25.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | IS | 03.10.2015 | PT | 06.10.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0955497 (KIKKOMAN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 35; claims 23,24 *; | [X] - SASSA T, "Structure and Absolute Configuration of Macrophage Fruit Rot Toxin A", AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, JAPAN SOC. FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND AGROCHEM, TOKYO, JP, (19830601), vol. 47, no. 6, ISSN 0002-1369, pages 1417 - 1418, XP003010780 [X] 3 * page 1417; figure 1; compound IV * | [DY] - NAKAMURA H ET AL, "Convergent and short-step syntheses of dl-Cypridina luciferin and its analogues based on Pd-mediated cross couplings", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000301), vol. 41, no. 13, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 2185 - 2188, XP004192703 [DY] 2,3 * page 2186; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)00131-3 | [DY] - KISHI, YOSHITO ET AL, "Cypridina bioluminescence. III. Total synthesis of Cypridina luciferin", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS; ISSN: 0040-4039, (1966), no. 29, pages 3445 - 3450, XP002568772 [DY] 2,3 * page 3447, paragraph L - page 3449 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/LA051191S | [Y] - BAGANZ H ET AL, "Reaktionen von alpha-Diazocarbonyl-Verbindungen mit tert.-Butylhypochlorit", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, VERLAG CHEMIE GMBH. WEINHEIM, DE, (19660101), vol. 99, ISSN 0009-2940, pages 3766 - 3770, XP009129389 [Y] 1 * the whole document; in particular, page 3768, first paragraph, and page 3769, second paragraph * | [Y] - WIBERG, KENNETH B. ET AL, "The stereochemistry of the Wolff rearrangement", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY; ISSN: 0002-7863, (1956), vol. 78, no. 8, pages 1640 - 1645, XP002568773 [Y] 1 * the whole document; in particular, page 1643, first column, sixth paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01589a039 | [A] - AOYAMA, TOYOHIKO ET AL, "New methods and reagents in organic synthesis. 8. Trimethylsilyldiazomethane , a new, stable, and safe reagent for the classical Arndt-Eistert synthesis", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS; ISSN: 0040-4039, (1980), vol. 21, no. 46, pages 4461 - 4462, XP002568774 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)92200-7 | [PX] - WU ET AL, "Syntheses and evaluation of the bioluminescent activity of (S)-Cypridina luciferin and its analogs", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060130), vol. 47, no. 5, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 753 - 756, XP005222424 [PX] 1-3 * the whole document; in particular, page 754, scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2005.11.119 |