17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
25.10.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
30.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
24.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
16.11.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
09.11.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.11.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
22.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] |
22.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.05.2011 |
First examination report |
|
03.05.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.01.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
22.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2008 |
Change - inventor |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
30.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
30.05.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
15.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.2008 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|