EP1944518 - BEARING DEVICE FOR WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMORI, Kazuo c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 02 /
KIUCHI, Masahiro c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 03 /
BABA, Kazuhiro c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | [2013/31] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
KOMORI, Kazuo c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | ||
02 /
KIUCHI, Masahiro c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | |||
03 /
BABA, Kazuhiro c/o NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06811041.0 | 02.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006JP319693 | Priority number, date | JP20050287267 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005287267 | JP20050306888 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005306888 | JP20050306889 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005306889 | JP20050313155 | 27.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005313155 | JP20050316053 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005316053 | JP20060214124 | 07.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006214124 | [2008/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007037477 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1944518 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1944518 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/58, B60B35/18, F16C19/18, F16C33/64 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
B60B27/0005 (EP,US);
B60B27/0084 (EP,US);
B60B27/0094 (EP,US);
F16C19/186 (EP,US);
F16C33/581 (EP,US);
F16C33/585 (EP,US);
F16C33/64 (EP,US);
F16C19/185 (EP,US);
F16C2240/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/43] |
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LAGERVORRICHTUNG FÜR RAD | [2008/29] | English: | BEARING DEVICE FOR WHEEL | [2008/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF A PALIER POUR ROUE | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2008 | Translation filed | 30.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 01.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5501530 (NAGAI KENICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,8-12 * the whole document * * column 5, line 62 - column 7, line 13 * * figures 4-6 *; | [Y]JPH1162985 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [Y] 1,8-12 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]JP2000110839 (NSK LTD) [Y] 8-12 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2001007600 (TAJIMA EIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 9-12 * paragraphs [0009] - [0015] - [0035] - [0039] * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2002121020 (OBARA RIKURO [JP]) [A] 8-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] *; | [Y]JP2004052784 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [Y] 1,8-12 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]JP2004100754 (NSK LTD) [Y] 9-12 * abstract * * figures 2-11 *; | [YD]JP2004108449 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [YD] 1,8-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * figures 1-9 *; | WO2005045268 [ ] (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005111771 (SHEVKET CENGIZ R [US]) [Y] 1,8-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0016] , [0018] - [0021]; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2005140181 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [Y] 9-12 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [Y]EP1548307 (NSK LTD [JP]) [Y] 11,12 * the whole document * * table 7 * |