EP1932589 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cataler Corporation 7800, Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKI, Kenichi c/o Cataler Corporation, 7800, Chihama Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 4371492 / JP | 02 /
HIRAI, Akimasa c/o Cataler Corporation, 7800, Chihama Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 4371492 / JP | 03 /
KITAMURA, Ichiro c/o Cataler Corporation, 7800, Chihama Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 4371492 / JP | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Goddar, Heinz J. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06811224.2 | 04.10.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006JP319885 | Priority number, date | JP20050292626 | 05.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005292626 | [2008/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007040248 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1932589 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/63, B01D53/86, B01D53/94 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
B01J23/40 (EP,US);
B01J23/464 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/206 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2092 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/28] |
Former [2008/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSKATALYSATOR | [2008/25] | English: | EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CATALYST | [2008/25] | French: | CATALYSEUR D'EPURATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2008 | Translation filed | 20.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 11.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.08.2016 | 22.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/50] | 01.08.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 18.08.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0262962 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [Y] 4 * table 1 * * claim 3 *; | [XYI]EP0462593 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1 * examples 7,9 * * table 1 * [Y] 4 [I] 4,6; | [XI]US5459119 (ABE FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 39 * * column 10, lines 13-50 * * page 12, lines 19-52 * * table 1 * * figure 1B * [I] 6; | [A]WO9535152 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * * page 21, lines 6-9 * * claims 26,28,29 *; | [A]WO9723278 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]EP0852966 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1066874 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO03035256 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 1 * examples 1,2,4 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 1 * [I] 2-6 | Examination | US4152301 | US5001103 | EP0566401 | US6348430 | WO02083301 | WO2005077497 |