EP1950551 - PROBE AND CANTILEVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAMIKI SEIMITSU HOUSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 8-22, Shinden 3-chome, Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8511 / JP | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYAMA, Kouji c/o NAMIKI SEIMITSU HOUSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 8-22, Shinden 3-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8511 / JP | 02 /
KOTAKI, Toshiro c/o NAMIKI SEIMITSU HOUSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 8-22, Shinden 3-chome Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8511 / JP | 03 /
SUNAGAWA, Kazuhiko c/o NAMIKI SEIMITSU HOUSEKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 8-22, Shinden 3-chome, Adachi-ku Tokyo 123-8511 / JP | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06811462.8 | 06.10.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006JP320135 | Priority number, date | JP20050294183 | 06.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005294183 | [2008/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007040283 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1950551 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N13/16, G12B21/02 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
G01Q60/38 (EP,US);
G01Q70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, LI [2008/44] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SONDE UND CANTILEVER | [2008/31] | English: | PROBE AND CANTILEVER | [2008/31] | French: | SONDE ET LEVIER | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2008 | Translation filed | 06.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 07.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 06.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0468071 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 2A-2E * * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, line 40 - page 7, line 21 * [Y] 3; | [Y]EP0475559 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 58 - column 7, line 3 *; | [A] - OLBRICH A ET AL, "High aspect ratio all diamond tips formed by focused ion beam for conducting atomic force microscopy", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B: MICROELECTRONICSPROCESSING AND PHENOMENA, AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990701), vol. 17, no. 4, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 1570 - 1574, XP012007612 [A] 1-4,2,4 * figures 2,5 * * paragraphs [00II] , [IIIA] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.590842 |