EP2080983 - NAVIGATION SYSTEM, MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE, AND ROUTE GUIDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Navitime Japan Co., Ltd. 8-38, Minami Aoyama 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIHARA, Kenichi c/o NAVITIME JAPAN CO., LTD. 8-38, Minami Aoyama 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 107-0062 / JP | [2014/27] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
AIHARA, Kenichi c/o NAVITIME JAPAN CO., LTD. 8-38, Minami Aoyama 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 107-0062 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06811740.7 | 13.10.2006 | [2009/30] | WO2006JP320461 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008044309 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080983 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080983 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00, G01S5/14, G01S17/32, G03B17/00, G06T11/80, G08G1/005 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
G01C21/3632 (EP,KR,US);
G01C21/3647 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/50 (EP,KR,US);
G08G1/005 (EP,KR,US);
G08G1/0969 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM, MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND ROUTENFÜHRUNGSVERFAHREN | [2009/30] | English: | NAVIGATION SYSTEM, MOBILE TERMINAL DEVICE, AND ROUTE GUIDING METHOD | [2009/30] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION, DISPOSITIF DE BORNE MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE GUIDAGE DE ROUTE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2009 | Translation filed | 09.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 15.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2013 | 10.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2006 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IE | 13.10.2014 | LU | 13.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IE | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
LU | 13.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003032436 (MIKUNI SHIN [JP]) [Y] 1-15* figures 2,6A,6B,6C *; | [Y]US2006155466 (KANDA ATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0008]; figures 3,4 * |