EP1935660 - INK-JET RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAI, Nobuyuki c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | 02 /
ENDO, Kenichi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Kazuhiko c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | 04 /
IIDA, Junichi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06812106.0 | 16.10.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006JP320981 | Priority number, date | JP20050300274 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005300274 | [2008/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007043713 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1935660 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1935660 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/50 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US);
B41M5/506 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | B41M5/00, B41J2/01, B41M5/50, B41M5/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/47] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2008/26] | English: | INK-JET RECORDING MEDIUM | [2008/26] | French: | SUPPORT D IMPRESSION À JET D ENCRE | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2008 | Translation filed | 11.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 15.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |