EP2083781 - DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILDEBERG, Jenny Gulmåravägen 24 438 33 Landvetter / SE | 02 /
KLINTE, Anna Carl Gunérs väg 13 436 40 Askim / SE | 03 /
HUSMARK, Ulrika Skogsvägen 6 435 38 Mölnlycke / SE | 04 /
DAHL, Dennis Polkavägen 3 435 39 Mölnlycke / SE | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [2013/36] |
Former [2009/32] | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06812967.5 | 02.11.2006 | [2009/32] | WO2006SE01243 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008054268 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083781 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2083781 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F5/441, A61L15/36, C12N1/00, A61K9/70 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
A61F13/84 (EP,US);
A61F13/47218 (EP,US);
A61F13/8405 (EP,US);
A61F5/441 (EP,US);
A61L15/18 (EP,US);
A61L15/34 (EP,US);
A61L15/36 (EP,US);
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61L2300/102 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | A61F13/15, A61F5/441, A61L15/36, C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | ABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2009/32] | English: | DELIVERY DEVICE | [2009/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 20.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2006 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | IE | 02.11.2013 | LU | 02.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4245630 (LLOYD RONALD, et al) [X] 1,3,7,13 * figure 2b * * column 2, lines 50-52 * * column 6, lines 1-57 * [A] 14-17 [Y] 2,4-6,8-12; | [A]WO9500087 (MEGADYNE MED PROD INC [US]) [A] 1* figures 1-7 *; | [XAY]US5780048 (LEE CHUNG CHIH [US]) [X] 1,7,12,13 * figure 1 * * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 57 * [A] 14-17 [Y] 2,4-6,8-11; | [XAY]FR2848535 (D LAB [FR]) [X] 1,3,7 * page 3, line 4 - page 3, line 31; figure 3 * [A] 14-17 [Y] 2,4-6,8-12 | International search | [A]US2066946 (REIMAN CLARENCE K); | [X]US3783869 (SCHNIPPER L); | [A]WO9309818 (WITTE STEFAN [SE]); | [A]GB2311727 (HANSON SHAW BEVERLEY JANE [GB]); | [A]WO9917813 (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE], et al) |