09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
09.08.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
22.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
31.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
29.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.04.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
16.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
16.03.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.02.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.02.2016 |
First examination report |
|
02.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
30.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
31.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
27.08.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.05.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
02.05.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
01.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|