EP1927243 - QUEUING AN AUTOMATIC CALL DISTRIBUTION CALL THAT HAS DISCONNECTED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2013/31] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Cisco Technologies, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 91534 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Johnny, H. 1525 S. Del Mar Avenue, No. B San Gabriel, CA 91776 / US | 02 /
JABBOUR, Fadi, R. 5151 Devon Park Court San Jose, CA 95136 / US | 03 /
LEE, David, C. 186 N. Sunnyvale Avenue, Apartment 3 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2009/11] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
LEE, Johnny, H. 1525 S. Del Mar Avenue, No. B San Gabriel, CA 91776 / US | ||
02 /
JABBOUR, Fadi, R. 695 S. Knickerbocker Drive, Apt. 18 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | |||
03 /
LEE, David, C. 186 N. Sunnyvale Avenue, Apartment 3 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2008/23] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06813705.8 | 23.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006US33077 | Priority number, date | US20050231598 | 20.09.2005 Original published format: US 231598 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007035222 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927243 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927243 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/523 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
H04M3/5231 (EP,US);
H04M3/48 (US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/40] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANRUFVERTEILUNG MIT WARTESCHLANGE FÜR ANRUFER DIE AUFLEGEN | [2018/16] | English: | QUEUING AN AUTOMATIC CALL DISTRIBUTION CALL THAT HAS DISCONNECTED | [2008/23] | French: | MISE EN FILE D'ATTENTE D'UN APPEL A DISTRIBUTION D'APPEL AUTOMATIQUE DECONNECTE | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/23] | SORTIERUNG EINES ANRUFS MIT AUTOMATISCHER ANRUFVERTEILUNG, DIE AUSGESCHALTET WURDE | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2006 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5181236 (LAVALLEE JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1-37* abstract *; | [X]WO9941895 (GENESYS TELECOMM LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-37 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 29 * * page 6, line 1 - page 12, line 20 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X] - "COMPUTERIZED CALL RETURN FEATURE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (198604), vol. 28, no. 11, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 4897 - 4901, XP000836268 [X] 1-37 * the whole document * |