EP1928521 - THROMBECTOMY CATHETER DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medrad, Inc. One Medrad Drive Indianola, PA 15051 / US | [2009/16] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states POSSIS MEDICAL INC. 9055 Evergreen Boulevard NW Minneapolis MN 55433-8003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOR, Eric, Joel 1707 Glenview Avenue Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US | 02 /
BONNETTE, Michael, John 2733 2nd Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | 03 /
AASEN, Nicole, Jaye 3243 Ulysses Street N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55418 / US | 04 /
ABBOTT, Martyn, Stuart 5734 Bent Creek Trail Minneapolis, TX 75252-2638 / US | 05 /
BALL, Douglas, James 10751 Redwood Street N.W. Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US | 06 /
CROLL, Walter, Charles 165 Crestview Drive North Maplewood, MN 55119 / US | 07 /
CUMMINGS, David, Charles 1305 Cherokee Drive Richardson, TX 75080 / US | 08 /
GRANT, Chad, Nicholas 4122-133 Via Candidiz San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 09 /
HILSE, Mark, Alfred 15465 5th Street N.E. San Diego, MN 55304 / US | 10 /
KARPINSKI, James, Fredrick 455 121st Lane N.E. Blaine, MN 55434 / US | 11 /
KNEIP, Daniel, Joseph 11052 Sheffield Drive Anna, TX 75409 / US | 12 /
ROGERS, Jeffrey, William 3416 Wheatland Lane Plano, TX 75025 / US | 13 /
SCHERGER, Ernest, Ralph 16176 Lake Blvd. Center City, MN 55012 / US | 14 /
TESCHENDORF, John, Lloyd 6208 Hollow Lane Lino Lakes, MN 55014 / US | 15 /
WEISEL, Stephen, Earl 2703 Duck View Circle Brook Park, Minnesota 55007 / US | 16 /
WEST, David, Woodruff 3116 Grantham Drive Richardson, TX 75082 / US | [2013/32] |
Former [2008/42] | 01 /
THOR, Eric, Joel 1707 Glenview Avenue Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US | ||
02 /
BONNETTE, Michael, John 2733 2nd Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | |||
03 /
AASEN, Nicole, Jaye 3243 Ulysses Street N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55418 / US | |||
04 /
ABBOTT, Martyn, Stuart 5734 Bent Creek Trail Minneapolis, TX 75252-2638 / US | |||
05 /
BALL, Douglas, James 10751 Redwood Street N.W. Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US | |||
06 /
CROLL, Walter, Charles 165 Crestview Drive North Maplewood, MN 55119 / US | |||
07 /
CUMMINGS, David, Charles 1305 Cherokee Drive Richardson, TX 75080 / US | |||
08 /
GRANT, Chad, Nicholas 4122-133 Via Candidiz San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
09 /
HILSE, Mark, Alfred 15465 5th Street N.E. San Diego, MN 55304 / US | |||
10 /
KARPINSKI, James, Fredrick 455 121st Lane N.E. Blaine, MN 55434 / US | |||
11 /
KNEIP, Daniel, Joseph 11052 Sheffield Drive Anna, TX 75409 / US | |||
12 /
ROGERS, Jeffrey, William 3416 Wheatland Lane Plano, TX 75025 / US | |||
13 /
SCHERGER, Ernest, Ralph 16176 Lake Blvd. Center City, MN 55012 / US | |||
14 /
TESCHENDORF, John, Lloyd 6208 Hollow Lane Lino Lakes, MN 55014 / US | |||
15 /
WEISEL, Stephen, Earl 2703 Duck View Circle Brook Park, Minnesota 55007 / US | |||
16 /
WEST, David, Woodruff 3116 Grantham Drive Richardson, TX 75082 / US | |||
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
THOR, Eric, Joel 1707 Glenview Avenue Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US | ||
02 /
BONNETTE, Michael, John 2733 2nd Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | |||
03 /
AASEN, Nicole, Jaye 3243 Ulysses Street N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55418 / US | |||
04 /
ABBOTT, Martyn, Stuart 5734 Bent Creek Trail Minneapolis, TX 75252-2638 / US | |||
05 /
BALL, Douglas, James 10751 Redwood Street N.W. Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US | |||
06 /
CROLL, Walter, Charles 165 Crestview Drive North Maplewood, MN 55119 / US | |||
07 /
CUMMINGS, David, Charles 1305 Cherokee Drive Richardson, TX 75080 / US | |||
08 /
GRANT, Chad, Nicholas 4122-133 Via Candidiz San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
09 /
HILSE, Mark, Alfred 15465 5th Street N.E. San Diego, MN 55304 / US | |||
10 /
KARPINSKI, James, Fredrick 455 121st Lane N.E. Blaine, MN 55434 / US | |||
11 /
KNEIP, Daniel, Joseph 11052 Sheffield Drive Anna, TX 75409 / US | |||
12 /
ROGERS, Jeffrey, William 3416 Wheatland Lane Plano, TX 75025 / US | |||
13 /
SCHERGER, Ernest, Ralph 16176 Lake Blvd. Center City, MN 55012 / US | |||
14 /
TESCHENDORF, John, Lloyd 6208 Hollow Lane Lino Lakes, MN 55014 / US | |||
15 /
WEISEL, Stephen, Earl 130 Center Avenue North Montrose, MN 55363 / US | |||
16 /
WEST, David, Woodruff 3116 Grantham Drive Richardson, TX 75082 / US | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds LS1 5BY / GB | ||
Former [2009/44] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne 5 South Parade Leeds, LS1 5QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 06815039.0 | 21.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006US36684 | Priority number, date | US20050237558 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: US 237558 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007038150 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1928521 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1928521 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M37/00, A61M29/00, A61B9/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A61M5/14232 (EP,US);
A61B17/22 (US);
A61B17/32037 (EP,US);
A61B50/10 (EP,US);
A61B50/13 (EP,US);
A61M25/0122 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | A61M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THROMBEKTOMIE-KATHETERFREISETZUNGSSYSTEM | [2008/24] | English: | THROMBECTOMY CATHETER DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM | [2008/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉPLOIEMENT DE CATHÉTER DE THROMBECTOMIE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 10.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 29.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12191214.1 / EP2556852 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2006 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | LV | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | LU | 21.09.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/25] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6096001 (DRASLER WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1,21,37,38 * column 7; figure 1 *; | [X]WO03006100 (NXSTAGE MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1,21,37,38 * page 9, line 9 - line 17; figures 1, 7A *; | [A]US6719717 (JOHNSON MATTHEW S [US], et al) [A] 1,21,37,38* column 2, line 18 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [X]US2004230212 (WULFMAN EDWARD I [US]) [X] 1,21,37,38 * paragraph [0058]; figure 5 * | International search | [Y]US4925444 (ORKIN FREDRIC I [US], et al); | [A]US5827229 (AUTH DAVID C [US], et al); | [A]US5879361 (NASH JOHN E [US]); | [Y]US6695803 (ROBINSON THOMAS C [US], et al); | [X]US6719717 (JOHNSON MATTHEW S [US], et al) | by applicant | US6096001 | WO03006100 |